Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3689   27/10/1943
LNER (1946 1st) 877   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 977   03/11/1946
BR 60977   02/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 1919
To Service Mon 27/10/1943 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 26/02/1962 off York (North) (50A)
Total Mileage 681,793
Scrapping During 03/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 18 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 27/10/1943
   Withdrawn 26/02/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   26/02/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/10/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3406)
19/07/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2962)
03/12/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 10508)
15/12/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29512)
23/01/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29540)
21/12/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29548)
01/03/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29485)
04/03/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
21/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
16/09/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29548)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 28/07/1945 08/09/1945 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/11/1945 24/11/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 12/06/1947 19/07/1947 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/08/1947 06/09/1947 16 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 01/11/1949 03/12/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 10508 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60977
 
Darlington Works 16/01/1951 10/02/1951 26 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 21/11/1951 15/12/1951 25 days General
Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 24/12/1953 23/01/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1954 26/01/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/02/1954 16/02/1954 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/10/1954 22/10/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/11/1955 21/12/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109)
 
Gateshead Works 29/03/1957 26/04/1957 29 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 03/02/1958 01/03/1958 27 days General
Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 03/03/1958 04/03/1958 2 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 17/04/1959 21/04/1959 5 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 16/10/1959 20/11/1959 36 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 30/12/1959 06/01/1960 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/08/1960 16/09/1960 40 days General
Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 22/01/1962 22/01/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/10/1943 To Service To service as LNER Number 3689
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1919
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
28/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.    
17/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 877 but not taken up    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 977    
12/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947.    
22/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947.    
19/07/1949 Modification Diagram 109 number 29396 boiler fitted    
19/07/1949 Modification Diagram 109 number 2962 boiler fitted    
01/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 10508 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60977
   
16/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951.    
21/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1951. Dep: 15/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109)
   
24/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1953. Dep: 23/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29540 (Diagram 109)
   
25/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 26/01/1954.    
09/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1954. Dep: 16/02/1954.    
18/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 22/10/1954.    
23/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 21/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109)
   
29/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1957. Dep: 26/04/1957.    
03/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109)
   
03/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1958. Dep: 04/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
17/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1959. Dep: 21/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
16/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1959. Dep: 20/11/1959.    
30/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/12/1959. Dep: 06/01/1960.    
08/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1960. Dep: 16/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109)
   
11/02/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
22/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/01/1962. Dep: 22/01/1962.    
26/02/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60977 from York (North) (50A)    
03/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Scrapyard, partially cut. SLS 5/1962 Link

prev prev