Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3688   07/10/1943
LNER (1946 1st) 876   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 976   04/12/1946
BR 60976   04/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 1918
To Service Mon 07/10/1943 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 26/09/1966 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Campbells (Airdrie)
Service Life 22 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to G H Campbell, Airdrie, 11/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 07/10/1943
56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 08/06/1958
52B Heaton 14/09/1958
52A Gateshead 16/06/1963
64A St Margarets 10/10/1965
   Withdrawn 26/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 3w/e 30/10/1965
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   26/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/10/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3388)
07/01/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 10509)
02/02/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29488)
25/02/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29456)
03/12/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28061)
24/01/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28054)
08/08/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
26/03/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
04/03/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29379)
25/08/1960 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
18/05/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28072)
18/05/1962 Smith speedometer fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 10/07/1945 19/09/1945 72 days General  
Darlington Works 06/10/1945 01/11/1945 27 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/07/1947 23/08/1947 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/11/1949 07/01/1950 41 days General
Boiler number 10509 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60976
 
Doncaster Works 11/01/1950 28/01/1950 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/01/1952 02/02/1952 32 days General
Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 27/01/1954 25/02/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 29456 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 04/11/1955 03/12/1955 30 days General
Boiler number 28061 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 05/12/1955 06/12/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 20/12/1957 24/01/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 28054 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 05/08/1958 08/08/1958 4 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 24/03/1959 26/03/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 05/08/1959 26/08/1959 22 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 04/02/1960 04/03/1960 30 days General
Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/06/1960 25/08/1960 64 days Heavy Casual
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 11/04/1962 18/05/1962 38 days General
Boiler number 28072 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/10/1943 To Service To service as LNER Number 3688
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1918
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
10/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1945. Dep: 19/09/1945.    
06/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 01/11/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 876 but not taken up    
04/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 976    
19/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947.    
28/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1949. Dep: 07/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 10509 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60976
   
11/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1950. Dep: 28/01/1950.    
02/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1952. Dep: 02/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 109)
   
27/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1954. Dep: 25/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29456 (Diagram 109)
   
04/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28061 (Diagram 109)
   
05/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 06/12/1955.    
20/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1957. Dep: 24/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28054 (Diagram 109)
   
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C)    
05/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1958. Dep: 08/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
14/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
24/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1959. Dep: 26/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
05/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1959. Dep: 26/08/1959.    
04/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1960. Dep: 04/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109)
   
23/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1960. Dep: 25/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
11/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1962. Dep: 18/05/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28072 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
10/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
26/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60976 from St Margarets (64A)    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie    

prev prev