|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1943 | 18/08/1943 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/10/1943 | 19/10/1943 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1944 | 14/12/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 871 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1946 | 28/05/1946 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1947 | 05/07/1947 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1948 | 25/11/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60971 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1950 | 12/07/1950 | 48 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1952 | 21/06/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29544 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1952 | 03/07/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1952 | 08/08/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1954 | 10/03/1954 | 54 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1955 | 30/07/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1955 | 03/08/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1957 | 25/05/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1959 | 12/05/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1960 | 21/03/1960 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1961 | 31/08/1961 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 29417 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1961 | 03/10/1961 | 20 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/06/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3683 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1911 Allocated to Eastfield (EFD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
16/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1943. Dep: 18/08/1943. | ||
18/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1943. Dep: 19/10/1943. | ||
15/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1944. Dep: 14/12/1944. | ||
20/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
11/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 871 |
||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 28/05/1946. | ||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 971 | ||
23/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947. | ||
07/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1948. Dep: 25/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60971 |
||
26/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/05/1950. Dep: 12/07/1950. | ||
27/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29544 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1952. Dep: 03/07/1952. | ||
04/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1952. Dep: 08/08/1952. | ||
16/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1954. Dep: 10/03/1954. | ||
01/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29511 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1955. Dep: 03/08/1955. | ||
29/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1957. Dep: 25/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
09/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1959. Dep: 12/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
11/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1960. Dep: 21/03/1960. | ||
05/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1961. Dep: 31/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29417 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1961. Dep: 03/10/1961. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60971 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Shieldhall |