|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 14/11/1943 | 29/11/1943 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1944 | 07/11/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/09/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Inverurie Works | 18/10/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1946 | 18/09/1946 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1946 | 04/10/1946 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1947 | 20/11/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1948 | 06/01/1949 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60969 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1949 | 20/01/1949 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/02/1949 | 19/02/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1951 | 30/06/1951 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1951 | 10/07/1951 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/06/1953 | 18/07/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1953 | 05/08/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1955 | 23/06/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1957 | 27/04/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29442 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1957 | 01/05/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1959 | 12/02/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1960 | 24/06/1960 | 50 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1961 | 14/09/1961 | 53 days | General | Smith speedometer and ATC fitted Boiler number 29523 (Diagram 109) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/04/1943 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3681 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1909 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
14/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/11/1943. Dep: 29/11/1943. | ||
15/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. | ||
09/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1944. Dep: 07/11/1944. | ||
02/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. | ||
18/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 869 but not taken up | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 969 | ||
06/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1946. Dep: 18/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29477 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/09/1946. Dep: 04/10/1946. | ||
06/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1947. Dep: 20/11/1947. | ||
12/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1948. Dep: 06/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60969 |
||
12/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1949. Dep: 20/01/1949. | ||
17/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1949. Dep: 19/02/1949. | ||
30/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/05/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951. | ||
02/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/07/1951. Dep: 10/07/1951. | ||
16/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1953. Dep: 18/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 05/08/1953. | ||
20/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1955. Dep: 23/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1957. Dep: 27/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29442 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1957. Dep: 01/05/1957. | ||
20/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
12/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1959. Dep: 12/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/05/1960. Dep: 24/06/1960. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
24/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1961. Dep: 14/09/1961. Work undertaken: Smith speedometer and ATC fitted Boiler number 29523 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60969 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |