Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3674   23/12/1942
LNER (1946 1st) 862   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 962   14/07/1946
BR 60962   22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 23/12/1942 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 20/09/1965 off Gateshead (52A)
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell)
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Ellis Metals, Swalwell, 10/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 23/12/1942
52B Heaton 10/06/1956
52A Gateshead 16/06/1963
   Withdrawn 20/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 20/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/12/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3315)
23/10/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2933)
22/03/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29476)
15/10/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28055)
14/05/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29549)
08/02/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29434)
07/11/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
24/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
08/06/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29376)
07/09/1962 Smith speedometer fitted
07/09/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29366)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 30/11/1944 13/01/1945 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/08/1946 31/08/1946 22 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/09/1948 23/10/1948 27 days General
Boiler number 2933 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 19/02/1951 22/03/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1952 04/10/1952 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 06/10/1952 08/10/1952 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/10/1953 12/12/1953 46 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/09/1954 15/10/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/04/1956 14/05/1956 34 days General
Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 08/01/1958 08/02/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 10/02/1958 12/02/1958 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/11/1958 07/11/1958 5 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 22/04/1959 24/04/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 02/05/1960 08/06/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 3160 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 27/06/1962 07/09/1962 73 days General
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/12/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3674
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
30/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 862 but not taken up    
14/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 962    
10/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 60962    
27/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2933 (Diagram 109)
   
19/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109)
   
28/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.    
06/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 08/10/1952.    
28/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953.    
13/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28055 (Diagram 109)
   
11/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1956. Dep: 14/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109)
   
10/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
08/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1958. Dep: 08/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109)
   
10/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1958. Dep: 12/02/1958.    
03/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
22/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
02/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1960. Dep: 08/06/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3160 (Diagram 109)
   
27/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1962. Dep: 07/09/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
20/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60962 from Gateshead (52A)    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell    

prev prev