|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 20/10/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1945 | 19/05/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1945 | 05/01/1946 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2994 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1947 | 19/06/1947 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E958 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1950 | 08/03/1950 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60958 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1950 | 16/03/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1951 | 26/10/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1953 | 07/03/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1953 | 19/03/1953 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1953 | 23/05/1953 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1953 | 14/08/1953 | 53 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1955 | 20/05/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1957 | 22/03/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1958 | 25/06/1958 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1959 | 31/12/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29463 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/10/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3670 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1897 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
20/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. | ||
17/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
25/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29527 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945. | ||
26/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2994 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 858 but not taken up | ||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 958 | ||
15/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1947. Dep: 19/06/1947. | ||
23/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E958 |
||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
13/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1950. Dep: 08/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29510 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60958 |
||
13/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1950. Dep: 16/03/1950. | ||
18/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/09/1951. Dep: 26/10/1951. | ||
02/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 07/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1953. Dep: 19/03/1953. | ||
23/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953. | ||
23/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 14/08/1953. | ||
22/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1955. Dep: 20/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29464 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1957. Dep: 22/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28056 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1958. Dep: 25/06/1958. | ||
20/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
23/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1959. Dep: 31/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29463 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60958 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
14/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |