|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/05/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2942 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/03/1945 | 31/03/1945 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1945 | 19/01/1946 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1947 | 28/11/1947 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1947 | 05/01/1948 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/12/1948 | 21/12/1948 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1949 | 03/06/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60955 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1949 | 15/06/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1951 | 10/05/1951 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1952 | 30/08/1952 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1952 | 04/09/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29443 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1955 | 07/10/1955 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1957 | 29/08/1957 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29360 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1958 | 11/03/1958 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1959 | 11/02/1960 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1962 | 17/08/1962 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1962 | 09/01/1963 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1965 | 27/07/1965 | 62 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1965 | 30/07/1965 | 2 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/12/1942 | N.E. Area engines in Dundee | N.E. Area engines now visit Dundee fairly often, 'C.7's' 716 and 714 noted 12/12 and 19/12, and 'B.16' 931 on 25/12. 'V.2' 3667 worked 9.55 a.m, Edinburgh-Aberdeen on 25/12. | SLS/194302 |
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
14/04/1963 | St. Rollox MPD (in steam) | in steam-60004/31/94, 60955 and 60525 under repair, and stored-42877, 45119, 45718/28/9/31; ex Works-44931, 45309 an 45478. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/09/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3667 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1894 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
10/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2942 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. | ||
03/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1945. Dep: 19/01/1946. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 855 but not taken up | ||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 955 | ||
25/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. | ||
25/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 28/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1947. Dep: 05/01/1948. | ||
08/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
13/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
19/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1948. Dep: 21/12/1948. | ||
23/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1949. Dep: 03/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60955 |
||
13/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/06/1949. Dep: 15/06/1949. | ||
07/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/04/1951. Dep: 10/05/1951. | ||
16/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1952. Dep: 04/09/1952. | ||
02/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29443 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1955. Dep: 07/10/1955. | ||
11/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1957. Dep: 29/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29360 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/02/1958. Dep: 11/03/1958. | ||
03/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. | ||
30/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1959. Dep: 11/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
14/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1962. Dep: 17/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1962. Dep: 09/01/1963. | ||
18/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
27/05/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/05/1965. Dep: 27/07/1965. | ||
29/07/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1965. Dep: 30/07/1965. | ||
26/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60955 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
11/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |