Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 371 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3962 Week
» 14097 Month
» 330328 Year
» 841430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3666   05/09/1942
LNER (1946 1st) 854   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 954   07/07/1946
BR 60954   22/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 05/09/1942 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 18/11/1963 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping Mon 09/12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 9/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 05/09/1942
   Withdrawn 18/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 18/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/09/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3236)
23/04/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3087)
18/08/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29496)
23/05/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29491)
02/12/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29446)
05/10/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29343)
29/10/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29405)
29/10/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
15/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
17/03/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28084)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 23/10/1944 02/12/1944 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/08/1946 07/09/1946 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/03/1949 23/04/1949 39 days General
Boiler number 3087 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60954
 
Darlington Works 04/07/1951 18/08/1951 46 days General
Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 20/08/1951 21/08/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/04/1953 23/05/1953 26 days General
Boiler number 9236 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 25/05/1953 28/05/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/11/1954 02/12/1954 32 days General
Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 31/08/1956 05/10/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 29343 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 24/09/1958 29/10/1958 36 days General
Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 10/04/1959 15/04/1959 6 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 02/02/1961 17/03/1961 44 days General
Boiler number 28084 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/04/1961 17/04/1961 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/01/1962 23/03/1962 59 days Heavy Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/09/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3666
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
23/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 854 but not taken up    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 954    
10/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946.    
16/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3087 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60954
   
04/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109)
   
20/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 21/08/1951.    
28/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 23/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9236 (Diagram 109)
   
25/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953.    
01/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1954. Dep: 02/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109)
   
31/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1956. Dep: 05/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29343 (Diagram 109)
   
24/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1958. Dep: 29/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29405 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
10/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1959. Dep: 15/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
02/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1961. Dep: 17/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28084 (Diagram 109)
   
11/02/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
11/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1961. Dep: 17/04/1961.    
24/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1962. Dep: 23/03/1962.    
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. SLS 5/1962 Link
18/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60954 from York (North) (50A)    
09/12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev