|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 26/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/04/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1945 | 15/09/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1945 | 01/02/1946 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 38 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1947 | 30/08/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1948 | 02/09/1948 | 24 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60953 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1948 | 06/09/1948 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1949 | 28/06/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1950 | 24/01/1951 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1951 | 15/06/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1953 | 21/02/1953 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1953 | 02/03/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1954 | 26/01/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1956 | 17/09/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1957 | 27/06/1957 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1959 | 20/04/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1959 | 14/05/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1961 | 07/10/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1962 | 26/04/1962 | 1 day | No repairs | Not repaired owing to severe derailment damage - engine been an side - CME decision to scrap |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/05/1962 | Bathgate MPD | Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. | SLS/196206 |
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Sidings) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/08/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3665 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1892 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
26/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29471 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/04/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. | ||
29/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/08/1945. Dep: 15/09/1945. | ||
24/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1945. Dep: 01/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29497 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 853 but not taken up | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 953 | ||
23/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. | ||
12/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 02/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60953 |
||
03/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/09/1948. Dep: 06/09/1948. | ||
26/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1949. Dep: 28/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
27/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1950. Dep: 24/01/1951. | ||
09/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1951. Dep: 15/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 21/02/1953. | ||
23/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 02/03/1953. | ||
22/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1954. Dep: 26/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29482 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1956. Dep: 17/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2918 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 27/06/1957. | ||
16/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1959. Dep: 20/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2905 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
05/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/05/1959. Dep: 14/05/1959. | ||
08/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29408 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/04/1962. Dep: 26/04/1962. Work undertaken: Not repaired owing to severe derailment damage - engine been an side - CME decision to scrap |
||
28/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60953 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |