Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3653   07/07/1942
LNER (1946 1st) 851   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 951   07/07/1946
BR 60951   09/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 07/07/1942 to Haymarket (HAY)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping Fri 22/11/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Cowlairs Works, 22/11/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HAY Haymarket (New) 07/07/1942
64A St Margarets 28/10/1957
64B Haymarket 21/04/1958
64A St Margarets 11/04/1960
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 07/05/1960
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/07/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3283)
09/03/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3469)
12/09/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2954)
09/12/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3302)
05/01/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29521)
09/10/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29514)
04/05/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29432)
04/03/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
04/03/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29509)
18/05/1961 Smith speedometer fitted
18/05/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29538)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 27/07/1942 10/08/1942 15 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 04/09/1943 18/09/1943 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/01/1944 12/02/1944 29 days General  
Cowlairs Works 01/09/1945 08/09/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 04/02/1946 09/03/1946 34 days General
Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 08/08/1947 12/09/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 28/10/1948 09/12/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60951
 
Darlington Works 21/10/1949 03/12/1949 44 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 27/12/1950 29/12/1950 3 days Light Casual
Tender in collision
 
Darlington Works 05/06/1951 09/06/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/11/1951 05/01/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 07/01/1952 08/01/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/09/1953 09/10/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 29514 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 15/05/1955 18/06/1955 35 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 01/04/1957 04/05/1957 34 days General
Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 03/02/1959 04/03/1959 30 days General
Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 16/03/1961 18/05/1961 64 days General
Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 24/05/1961 31/05/1961 8 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/07/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3653
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Haymarket (HAY)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
27/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/07/1942. Dep: 10/08/1942.    
04/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943.    
15/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944.    
01/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 851 but not taken up    
04/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29473 (Diagram 109)
   
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 951    
08/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1947. Dep: 12/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109)
   
28/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1948. Dep: 09/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3302 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60951
   
21/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949.    
27/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1950. Dep: 29/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender in collision
   
05/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951.    
29/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1951. Dep: 05/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109)
   
07/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1952. Dep: 08/01/1952.    
09/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1953. Dep: 09/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29514 (Diagram 109)
   
15/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 21/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Valve gear overhaul
   
15/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/05/1955. Dep: 18/06/1955.    
01/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29432 (Diagram 109)
   
28/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
21/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
03/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1959. Dep: 04/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
11/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
16/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1961. Dep: 18/05/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
24/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1961. Dep: 31/05/1961.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60951 from St Margarets (64A)    
22/11/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev