Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3651   18/06/1942
LNER (1946 1st) 849   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 949   30/05/1946
BR 60949   19/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 18/06/1942 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962 off Tweedmouth (52D)
Scrapping Thu 23/05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 23/5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) 18/06/1942
GHD Gateshead 28/03/1943
HTN Heaton 13/10/1946
52A Gateshead 01/07/1951
52D Tweedmouth 10/09/1961
   Withdrawn 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52A Gateshead w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 3w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/06/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3278)
27/12/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3047)
20/08/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9238)
07/02/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29451)
19/11/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29489)
01/08/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29368)
19/11/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
19/11/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29537)
13/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
04/03/1961 Smith speedometer fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 09/02/1944 11/03/1944 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/12/1945 12/01/1946 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/11/1947 27/12/1947 52 days General
Boiler number 3047 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 13/07/1949 20/08/1949 39 days General
Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60949
 
Gateshead Works 11/12/1950 15/12/1950 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/08/1951 22/09/1951 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 24/09/1951 25/09/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/01/1953 07/02/1953 24 days General
Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 09/02/1953 11/02/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/02/1953 27/02/1953 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/10/1954 19/11/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109)
 
Gateshead Works 20/03/1956 06/04/1956 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/06/1956 01/08/1956 49 days General
Boiler number 3137 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 10/10/1958 19/11/1958 41 days General
Boiler number 29537 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 09/04/1959 13/04/1959 5 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 30/01/1961 04/03/1961 34 days General
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/06/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3651
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
09/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944.    
08/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 849 but not taken up    
30/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 949    
13/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
06/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3047 (Diagram 109)
   
13/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29507 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60949
   
11/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1950. Dep: 15/12/1950.    
01/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
23/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951.    
24/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1951. Dep: 25/09/1951.    
15/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109)
   
09/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 11/02/1953.    
25/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1953. Dep: 27/02/1953.    
21/07/1954 Sightings Gateshead Works visit: Around the works. - Awaiting works. RO 9/1954 Link
21/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1954. Dep: 19/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2903 (Diagram 109)
   
20/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956.    
14/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1956. Dep: 01/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3137 (Diagram 109)
   
10/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1958. Dep: 19/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29537 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
09/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1959. Dep: 13/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
30/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 04/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Smith speedometer fitted
   
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60949 from Tweedmouth (52D)    
23/05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev