Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 371 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3962 Week
» 14097 Month
» 330328 Year
» 841430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3648   21/05/1942
LNER (1946 1st) 846   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 946   07/07/1946
BR 60946   03/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 21/05/1942 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 11/10/1965 off Gateshead (52A)
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 20 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Ellis Metals, Swalwell, 11/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 21/05/1942
51A Darlington 26/06/1955
50A York (North) 25/09/1955
51A Darlington 14/06/1959
51L Thornaby 13/09/1959
52A Gateshead 05/07/1964
   Withdrawn 11/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 5w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   11/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/05/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3266)
04/12/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3244)
31/03/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29458)
28/03/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29353)
05/03/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29366)
08/01/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29498)
15/01/1959 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
15/01/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29452)
03/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
02/09/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29491)
02/09/1961 Smith speedometer fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/06/1942 05/08/1942 48 days Heavy
Big end and middle cylinder failure
 
Doncaster Works 24/08/1944 07/10/1944 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/08/1946 21/09/1946 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/10/1948 04/12/1948 38 days General
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60946
 
Darlington Works 27/02/1951 31/03/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 20/12/1951 08/01/1952 20 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 24/02/1953 28/03/1953 33 days General
Boiler number 29353 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 30/03/1953 31/03/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/06/1954 22/06/1954 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 05/02/1955 05/03/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 07/03/1955 17/03/1955 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/06/1955 27/06/1955 22 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/12/1956 08/01/1957 36 days General
Boiler number 29498 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 08/12/1958 15/01/1959 39 days General
Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 02/04/1959 03/04/1959 2 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 04/08/1961 02/09/1961 30 days General
Boiler number 9236 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/05/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3648
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
19/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/06/1942. Dep: 05/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Big end and middle cylinder failure
   
24/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 846 but not taken up    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 946    
24/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.    
28/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60946
   
27/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109)
   
20/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1951. Dep: 08/01/1952.    
24/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29353 (Diagram 109)
   
30/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 31/03/1953.    
22/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/06/1954. Dep: 22/06/1954.    
05/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 109)
   
07/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1955. Dep: 17/03/1955.    
06/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1955. Dep: 27/06/1955.    
26/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
04/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1956. Dep: 08/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29498 (Diagram 109)
   
08/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1958. Dep: 15/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
02/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1959. Dep: 03/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
13/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
04/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1961. Dep: 02/09/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9236 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
05/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
11/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60946 from Gateshead (52A)    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell    

prev prev