Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 373 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3964 Week
» 14099 Month
» 330330 Year
» 841432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3644   13/03/1942
LNER (1946 1st) 842   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 942   17/11/1946
BR 60942   08/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 13/03/1942 to Gateshead (GHD)
Withdrawal Mon 25/05/1964 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping Mon 24/08/1964 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Sent to Swindon for cutting up, 24/8/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GHD Gateshead (New) 13/03/1942
52B Heaton 19/11/1950
52A Gateshead 04/03/1951
52B Heaton 09/09/1951
52A Gateshead 16/06/1957
50A York (North) 02/12/1962
   Withdrawn 25/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 52A Gateshead w/e 10/03/1951
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 08/12/1962
WDN   25/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/03/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3247)
30/08/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9231)
10/05/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2928)
31/12/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2954)
08/09/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29441)
14/11/1951 Modified pony truck
06/11/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29408)
14/12/1956 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
26/09/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
26/09/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29491)
02/03/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
08/07/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29541)
08/07/1961 Smith speedometer fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 07/01/1943 08/02/1943 33 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/07/1943 30/08/1943 47 days General
Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 25/08/1945 29/09/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/04/1947 10/05/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 2928 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/11/1948 31/12/1948 51 days General
Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 06/01/1949 13/01/1949 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/01/1949 28/01/1949 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/03/1950 27/03/1950 19 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 10/08/1950 08/09/1950 30 days General
Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 03/11/1951 14/11/1951 12 days Light Casual
Modified pony truck
 
Darlington Works 17/06/1952 12/07/1952 26 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 14/07/1952 15/07/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/01/1953 22/01/1953 21 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 07/10/1954 06/11/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 3307 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 08/11/1954 09/11/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/10/1955 19/11/1955 26 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 05/11/1956 14/12/1956 40 days Heavy Intermediate
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 17/12/1956 19/12/1956 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/12/1956 29/12/1956 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/08/1958 26/09/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 9236 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 26/02/1959 02/03/1959 5 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 16/11/1959 30/12/1959 45 days Heavy Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 06/06/1961 08/07/1961 33 days General
Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 28/07/1961 18/08/1961 22 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/03/1942 To Service To service as LNER Number 3644
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gateshead (GHD)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
07/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1943. Dep: 08/02/1943.    
15/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1943. Dep: 30/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109)
   
25/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 842 but not taken up    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 942    
12/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2928 (Diagram 109)
   
08/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 60942    
11/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109)
   
06/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 13/01/1949.    
18/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/01/1949. Dep: 28/01/1949.    
09/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1950. Dep: 27/03/1950.    
10/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1950. Dep: 08/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29441 (Diagram 109)
   
19/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
04/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
03/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 14/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Modified pony truck
   
17/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/06/1952. Dep: 12/07/1952.    
14/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1952. Dep: 15/07/1952.    
02/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1953. Dep: 22/01/1953.    
07/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3307 (Diagram 109)
   
08/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1954. Dep: 09/11/1954.    
25/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955.    
05/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/11/1956. Dep: 14/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
17/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1956. Dep: 19/12/1956.    
24/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956.    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
25/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9236 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
26/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
16/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1959. Dep: 30/12/1959.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
06/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1961. Dep: 08/07/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29541 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
28/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1961. Dep: 18/08/1961.    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 60942 from York (North) (50A)    
24/08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev