|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 48 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1945 | 31/08/1945 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 2908 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1949 | 30/07/1949 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3107 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60939 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1951 | 14/08/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1951 | 23/08/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28061 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1954 | 27/04/1954 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1955 | 24/03/1955 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1955 | 23/09/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29520 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1957 | 17/04/1957 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1958 | 08/05/1958 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1958 | 22/08/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1959 | 11/03/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1961 | 09/12/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1961 | 30/12/1961 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1962 | 26/01/1962 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1962 | 02/11/1962 | 23 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Outside Stripping Shop) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
25/03/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex-Works) | Ex-Works on 51A: D3072, D3874, D5108, 43055, 43101, 60835, 60939, 61019/39, 63388, 65794, 65889/92, 68011, 80116, 90072, 90342, 90503. Waiting works on 51A: 12115, 43070/5, 46494, 60811/44, 61237, 68754, 78015, 92098. | SLS/196205 |
08/07/1962 | York South MPD | Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. | SLS/196208 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/02/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3641 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1878 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
22/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. | ||
06/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1945. Dep: 31/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2908 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 839 but not taken up | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 939 | ||
22/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
15/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3107 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60939 |
||
27/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1951. Dep: 14/08/1951. | ||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951. | ||
10/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28061 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1954. Dep: 27/04/1954. | ||
15/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 24/03/1955. | ||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 23/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29520 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 17/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
16/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/04/1958. Dep: 08/05/1958. | ||
20/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 22/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
06/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1959. Dep: 11/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
14/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
10/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29346 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
20/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1961. Dep: 30/12/1961. | ||
26/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/01/1962. Dep: 26/01/1962. | ||
11/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962. | ||
12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60939 from York (North) (50A) | ||
16/10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |