|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1943 | 13/11/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1945 | 29/09/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1947 | 10/10/1947 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1949 | 27/10/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 10506 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60938 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1951 | 06/09/1951 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1953 | 22/07/1953 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1955 | 05/08/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1957 | 15/08/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1957 | 26/08/1957 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1958 | 29/08/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1959 | 10/07/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1959 | 08/08/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1961 | 23/02/1962 | 68 days | General | Split rail Boiler number 29425 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1962 | 25/09/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. | SLS/194912 |
10/07/1957 | Darlington Works | On the 10th July, D49/2 62727, B16/2 61435 and J26 65755 were noted repainted with the new emblem. There were no engines in the scrap yard waiting cutting up and all that could be seen were the wheels of A5 tank 69833. On Wednesday, 21st August, B1 61131 re-painted ex works was observed at Hett Mill working north on a goods about noon. In the afternoon, B1 61080 also repainted ex works was observed at Cowton working a south bound goods. On the same day, V1 67674, V2 60938 and O7 90469 were noted outside Darlington Works having been overhauled and repainted. In the sidings across Whessoe Road from the works, V2 60914, D49/1 62713, J77 68426 and D20 62387 were observed standing dead. In the scrap yard, T1 69916 was in course of being cut up, only the frames and wheels remaining. Diesel trains are working some services between Darlington and Richmond. With the commencement of the Winter timetable, further diesel trains are expected to be allocated to the Newcastle-Middlesbrough services. | SLS/195709 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/01/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4899 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1877 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
23/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943. | ||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945. | ||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 838 but not taken up | ||
24/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 938 | ||
16/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1949. Dep: 27/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10506 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60938 |
||
11/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/08/1951. Dep: 06/09/1951. | ||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1953. Dep: 22/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
07/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29381 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) |
||
14/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1957. Dep: 15/08/1957. | ||
21/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1957. Dep: 26/08/1957. | ||
26/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1958. Dep: 29/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
30/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/07/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959. | ||
29/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
18/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1961. Dep: 23/02/1962. Work undertaken: Split rail Boiler number 29425 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
25/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/09/1962. Dep: 25/09/1962. | ||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60938 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |