|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1943 | 17/03/1943 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1947 | 01/02/1947 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1947 | 03/01/1948 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1948 | 23/10/1948 | 23 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60934 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1951 | 20/09/1951 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1953 | 02/10/1953 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1954 | 20/12/1954 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1955 | 01/10/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1955 | 05/10/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1957 | 16/10/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29340 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1958 | 24/10/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1958 | 22/01/1959 | 53 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1959 | 07/04/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1959 | 19/11/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1960 | 10/06/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/01/1942 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3661 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1893 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1943. Dep: 17/03/1943. | ||
15/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. | ||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 834 but not taken up | ||
06/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 934 | ||
08/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1947. Dep: 01/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1947. Dep: 03/01/1948. | ||
01/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60934 |
||
25/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29502 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1953. Dep: 02/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29470 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 20/12/1954. Dep: 20/12/1954. | ||
07/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1955. Dep: 01/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 05/10/1955. | ||
17/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1957. Dep: 16/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29340 (Diagram 109) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
21/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1958. Dep: 24/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
01/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 22/01/1959. | ||
02/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1959. Dep: 07/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1959. Dep: 19/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1960. Dep: 10/06/1960. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60934 from Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
03/05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |