Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 373 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3964 Week
» 14099 Month
» 330330 Year
» 841432 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3656   25/06/1941
LNER (1946 1st) 829   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 929   12/12/1946
BR 60929   11/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1922
To Service Mon 25/06/1941 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 21/06/1965 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for cutting up by J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 8/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 25/06/1941
YK York (North) 26/07/1941
51A Darlington 06/07/1952
50A York (North) 14/09/1952
52A Gateshead 08/06/1958
52D Tweedmouth 10/09/1961
50A York (North) 02/12/1962
   Withdrawn 21/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 3w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 50A York (North) w/e 08/12/1962
WDN   21/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
25/06/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9229)
18/06/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2897)
08/07/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2927)
14/01/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3242)
02/11/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29515)
08/01/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29506)
11/01/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29380)
21/09/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29443)
22/10/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
12/05/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
19/11/1960 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
19/11/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28083)
03/07/1963 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28067)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 09/05/1942 09/05/1942 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/05/1943 18/06/1943 42 days General
Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1945 08/07/1945 77 days General
Boiler number 2927 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 02/07/1947 26/07/1947 25 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/12/1949 14/01/1950 40 days General
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60929
 
Darlington Works 01/10/1951 02/11/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 07/11/1951 16/11/1951 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 26/11/1951 30/11/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 07/12/1953 08/01/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 15/09/1954 17/09/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 06/12/1955 11/01/1956 37 days General
Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/03/1957 27/03/1957 17 days Unclassified
After collision
 
Darlington Works 26/08/1957 21/09/1957 27 days General
Boiler number 29443 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 24/12/1957 23/01/1958 31 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/10/1958 22/10/1958 10 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 08/05/1959 12/05/1959 5 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 05/09/1960 19/11/1960 76 days General
Boiler number 28083 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 21/05/1963 03/07/1963 44 days General
Boiler number 28067 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 09/07/1963 11/07/1963 3 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/06/1941 To Service To service as LNER Number 3656
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1922
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
26/07/1941 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
09/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942.    
08/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1943. Dep: 18/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2897 (Diagram 109)
   
23/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1945. Dep: 08/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2927 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 829 but not taken up    
12/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 929    
02/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1947. Dep: 26/07/1947.    
06/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1949. Dep: 14/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60929
   
01/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29515 (Diagram 109)
   
07/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1951. Dep: 16/11/1951.    
26/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 30/11/1951.    
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
07/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1953. Dep: 08/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 109)
   
15/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/09/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954.    
06/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1955. Dep: 11/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29380 (Diagram 109)
   
11/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1957. Dep: 27/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
26/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1957. Dep: 21/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29443 (Diagram 109)
   
24/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 23/01/1958.    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
13/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
08/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1959. Dep: 12/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
05/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28083 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
21/05/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1963. Dep: 03/07/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28067 (Diagram 109)
   
09/07/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1963. Dep: 11/07/1963.    
21/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60929 from York (North) (50A)    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev