Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3655   24/06/1941
LNER (1946 1st) 828   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 928   27/11/1946
BR 60928   29/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1921
To Service Mon 24/06/1941 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Mon 05/03/1962 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping During 06/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Cut-up Darlington Works
6/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 24/06/1941
GOR Gorton 29/10/1944
DON Doncaster 23/04/1947
70A Nine Elms (on loan) 14/05/1953
36A Doncaster 09/07/1953
   Withdrawn 05/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster 23/04/1947
LOAN 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 16/05/1953
EXLOAN 36A Doncaster 4w/e 11/07/1953
WDN   05/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/06/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9191)
01/03/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9169)
29/04/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9543)
15/01/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29354)
11/01/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29440)
23/01/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29506)
23/10/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
08/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 01/05/1943 29/05/1943 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/03/1945 28/04/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/01/1947 01/03/1947 49 days General
Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 16/03/1949 29/04/1949 45 days General
Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60928
 
Doncaster Works 17/03/1951 20/04/1951 35 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 20/01/1952 04/02/1952 16 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 15/12/1952 15/01/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 07/12/1954 11/01/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 14/12/1956 23/01/1957 41 days General
Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 15/10/1958 23/10/1958 9 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1959 08/04/1959 38 days Heavy Intermediate
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1959 08/05/1959 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/11/1959 07/12/1959 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/05/1960 02/06/1960 29 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 19/06/1961 08/07/1961 20 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 21/02/1962 21/02/1962 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/06/1941 To Service To service as LNER Number 3655
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1921
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
01/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943.    
29/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 28/04/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 828 but not taken up    
27/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 928    
12/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109)
   
23/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1949. Dep: 29/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29358 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60928
   
17/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/03/1951. Dep: 20/04/1951.    
20/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1952. Dep: 04/02/1952.    
15/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1952. Dep: 15/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29354 (Diagram 109)
   
14/05/1953 Allocation Loaned to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
07/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1954. Dep: 11/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29440 (Diagram 109)
   
14/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1956. Dep: 23/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3134 (Diagram 109)
   
15/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
02/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 08/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
23/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1959. Dep: 08/05/1959.    
25/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1959. Dep: 07/12/1959.    
05/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1960. Dep: 02/06/1960.    
26/02/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.   Link
19/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1961. Dep: 08/07/1961.    
21/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 21/02/1962. Dep: 21/02/1962.    
05/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60928 from Doncaster (36A)    
06/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev