Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 371 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3962 Week
» 14097 Month
» 330328 Year
» 841430 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4896   04/12/1941
LNER (1946 1st) 825   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 925   15/12/1946
BR 60925   31/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 04/12/1941 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 25/05/1964 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Sent to Swindon for cutting up, 8/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 04/12/1941
   Withdrawn 25/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   25/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/12/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3230)
29/12/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3124)
03/04/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3472)
14/06/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3061)
05/11/1951 Modified pony truck
09/08/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29457)
21/10/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29423)
27/08/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29452)
15/10/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
15/10/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29517)
16/03/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
23/09/1961 Smith speedometer fitted
23/09/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29487)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 02/02/1944 04/03/1944 32 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/11/1945 29/12/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 08/01/1947 01/02/1947 25 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 26/02/1948 03/04/1948 38 days General
Boiler number 3472 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60925
 
Darlington Works 11/05/1950 14/06/1950 35 days General
Boiler number 3061 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 20/06/1950 21/06/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/10/1951 05/11/1951 13 days Light Casual
Modified pony truck
 
Darlington Works 27/06/1952 09/08/1952 44 days General
Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 21/09/1954 21/10/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 07/07/1956 27/08/1956 52 days General
Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 15/02/1957 16/03/1957 30 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 01/04/1957 01/04/1957 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 02/05/1958 02/05/1958 1 day Special
Weigh tender
 
Darlington Works 01/09/1958 15/10/1958 45 days General
Boiler number 29517 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 24/10/1958 07/11/1958 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/01/1959 12/01/1959 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/03/1959 16/03/1959 5 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 21/08/1961 23/09/1961 34 days General
Boiler number 3136 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/12/1941 To Service To service as LNER Number 4896
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
02/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944.    
10/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 825 but not taken up    
15/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 925    
08/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/01/1947. Dep: 01/02/1947.    
26/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3472 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60925
   
11/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3061 (Diagram 109)
   
20/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 21/06/1950.    
24/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1951. Dep: 05/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Modified pony truck
   
27/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109)
   
21/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1954. Dep: 21/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109)
   
07/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1956. Dep: 27/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109)
   
15/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957.    
01/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 01/04/1957.    
02/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 02/05/1958. Dep: 02/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Weigh tender
   
01/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 15/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29517 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
24/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958.    
02/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 12/01/1959.    
12/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1959. Dep: 16/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
21/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3136 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
25/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 60925 from York (North) (50A)    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev