|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1945 | 29/12/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1947 | 01/02/1947 | 25 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1948 | 03/04/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3472 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60925 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1950 | 14/06/1950 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3061 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1950 | 21/06/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1951 | 05/11/1951 | 13 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1952 | 09/08/1952 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1954 | 21/10/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1956 | 27/08/1956 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1957 | 01/04/1957 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1958 | 02/05/1958 | 1 day | Special | Weigh tender |
||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1958 | 15/10/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29517 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1958 | 07/11/1958 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1959 | 12/01/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1959 | 16/03/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/12/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4896 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1874 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. | ||
10/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3124 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 825 but not taken up | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 925 | ||
08/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/01/1947. Dep: 01/02/1947. | ||
26/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3472 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60925 |
||
11/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3061 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 21/06/1950. | ||
24/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1951. Dep: 05/11/1951. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
27/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1952. Dep: 09/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1954. Dep: 21/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29423 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1956. Dep: 27/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29452 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957. | ||
01/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 01/04/1957. | ||
02/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 02/05/1958. Dep: 02/05/1958. Work undertaken: Weigh tender |
||
01/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 15/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29517 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
24/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1958. Dep: 07/11/1958. | ||
02/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 12/01/1959. | ||
12/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1959. Dep: 16/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
21/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
25/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60925 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |