|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 04/01/1943 | 18/01/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1943 | 13/08/1943 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1944 | 01/11/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1945 | 03/03/1945 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 18 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1947 | 22/02/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1950 | 14/12/1950 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1952 | 06/03/1952 | 11 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1952 | 12/04/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1952 | 07/05/1952 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1952 | 01/09/1952 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/01/1954 | 03/02/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29520 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1955 | 02/07/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29475 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1955 | 11/07/1955 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1956 | 12/01/1957 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1957 | 15/01/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1958 | 17/06/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1958 | 01/07/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1958 | 11/12/1958 | 29 days | Light Casual | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1959 | 19/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1960 | 26/11/1960 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1961 | 17/11/1961 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1963 | 06/05/1963 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1963 | 08/02/1964 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1964 | 12/02/1964 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (under repair) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/11/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4894 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1872 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
04/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1943. Dep: 18/01/1943. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
01/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1943. Dep: 13/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29379 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1944. Dep: 01/11/1944. | ||
10/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 823 but not taken up | ||
20/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. | ||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 923 | ||
15/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. | ||
12/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. | ||
04/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60923 | ||
19/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 14/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29457 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1952. Dep: 06/03/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 12/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29538 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1952. Dep: 07/05/1952. | ||
14/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1952. Dep: 01/09/1952. | ||
05/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 03/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29520 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29475 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1955. Dep: 11/07/1955. | ||
13/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29446 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
14/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1957. Dep: 15/01/1957. | ||
13/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29508 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1958. Dep: 01/07/1958. | ||
13/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1958. Dep: 11/12/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1959. Dep: 19/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1960. Dep: 26/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29526 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1961. Dep: 17/11/1961. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
09/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1963. Dep: 06/05/1963. | ||
06/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1963. Dep: 08/02/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1964. Dep: 12/02/1964. | ||
04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60923 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |