Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4890   07/09/1941
LNER (1946 1st) 819   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 919   22/09/1946
BR 60919   01/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Fri 07/09/1941 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1966 off Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 24 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Old Kirkpatrick, 10/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) 07/09/1941
GHD Gateshead 28/03/1943
TWD Tweedmouth 14/02/1944
GHD Gateshead 24/04/1944
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 13/10/1945
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 11/05/1964
   Withdrawn 02/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   02/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/09/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3160)
15/07/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9229)
01/10/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3003)
09/11/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29445)
26/05/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29528)
16/08/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29466)
04/06/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
04/06/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29525)
13/01/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29350)
13/01/1961 Smith speedometer fitted
14/08/1963 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29476)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 21/04/1942 06/05/1942 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/06/1943 15/07/1943 37 days General
Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 10/03/1945 21/04/1945 43 days General  
Darlington Works 11/01/1947 08/03/1947 57 days General  
Darlington Works 16/04/1948 14/05/1948 29 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 09/09/1948 01/10/1948 23 days General
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60919
 
Darlington Works 04/10/1948 14/10/1948 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/08/1949 19/10/1949 66 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 09/10/1950 09/11/1950 32 days General
Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109)
 
Inverurie Works 17/04/1951 19/04/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/10/1952 01/11/1952 24 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 13/11/1952 16/11/1952 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/04/1954 26/05/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 12/11/1955 17/12/1955 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 19/12/1955 20/12/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 01/07/1957 16/08/1957 47 days General
Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 29/04/1959 04/06/1959 37 days General
Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 01/12/1960 13/01/1961 44 days General
Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 18/06/1963 14/08/1963 58 days General
Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 26/09/1963 19/10/1963 24 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/07/1965 20/08/1965 46 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/09/1941 To Service To service as LNER Number 4890
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
21/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1942. Dep: 06/05/1942.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
09/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1943. Dep: 15/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29495 (Diagram 109)
   
14/02/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (TWD)    
24/04/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
10/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.    
13/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 819 but not taken up    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 919    
11/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.    
16/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948.    
09/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60919
   
04/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1948. Dep: 14/10/1948.    
15/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 19/10/1949.    
09/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1950. Dep: 09/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109)
   
17/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951.    
09/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 01/11/1952.    
13/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1952. Dep: 16/11/1952.    
28/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1954. Dep: 26/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29528 (Diagram 109)
   
12/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955.    
19/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1955. Dep: 20/12/1955.    
01/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 16/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29466 (Diagram 109)
   
29/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1959. Dep: 04/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
01/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1960. Dep: 13/01/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29350 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
18/06/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1963. Dep: 14/08/1963.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29476 (Diagram 109)
   
26/09/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1963. Dep: 19/10/1963.    
11/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
06/07/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1965. Dep: 20/08/1965.    
02/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60919 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
10/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev