Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4889   28/08/1941
LNER (1946 1st) 818   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 918   09/11/1946
BR 60918   31/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 28/08/1941 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 08/10/1962 off York (North) (50A)
Scrapping Wed 17/10/1962 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 17/10/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 28/08/1941
   Withdrawn 08/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   08/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/08/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3158)
01/06/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3034)
09/11/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3309)
31/12/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3115)
22/09/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29479)
11/01/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29439)
14/08/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
11/03/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 28/04/1943 01/06/1943 35 days General
Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 31/03/1945 26/05/1945 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/10/1946 09/11/1946 13 days General
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 918
 
Darlington Works 11/11/1948 31/12/1948 51 days General
Boiler number 3115 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60918
 
Darlington Works 06/01/1949 15/01/1949 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/01/1949 26/01/1949 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/01/1950 20/01/1950 19 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 21/08/1951 22/09/1951 33 days General
Boiler number 29479 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 02/11/1951 21/11/1951 20 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/12/1951 08/01/1952 30 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/08/1953 10/08/1953 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 07/09/1953 08/09/1953 2 days Weighing  
Darlington Works 23/09/1953 29/10/1953 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 17/03/1955 19/04/1955 34 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/04/1955 10/05/1955 16 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 20/01/1956 24/02/1956 36 days General  
Darlington Works 06/12/1957 11/01/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 29439 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/08/1958 14/08/1958 4 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 09/03/1959 11/03/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 20/05/1960 01/07/1960 43 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/08/1941 To Service To service as LNER Number 4889
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
28/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1943. Dep: 01/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 109)
   
31/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 818 but not taken up    
28/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 918
   
11/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3115 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60918
   
06/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 15/01/1949.    
24/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1949. Dep: 26/01/1949.    
02/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 20/01/1950.    
21/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29479 (Diagram 109)
   
02/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1951. Dep: 21/11/1951.    
10/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1951. Dep: 08/01/1952.    
10/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/08/1953. Dep: 10/08/1953.    
07/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/09/1953. Dep: 08/09/1953.    
23/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/09/1953. Dep: 29/10/1953.    
17/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 19/04/1955.    
25/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 10/05/1955.    
20/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1956. Dep: 24/02/1956.    
06/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29439 (Diagram 109)
   
11/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 14/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
09/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 11/03/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
20/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1960. Dep: 01/07/1960.    
08/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60918 from York (North) (50A)    
17/10/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev