|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/04/1943 | 01/06/1943 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 918 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1948 | 31/12/1948 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3115 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60918 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1949 | 15/01/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1949 | 26/01/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/01/1950 | 20/01/1950 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1951 | 22/09/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29479 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1951 | 21/11/1951 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1951 | 08/01/1952 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1953 | 10/08/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1953 | 08/09/1953 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1953 | 29/10/1953 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1955 | 19/04/1955 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1955 | 10/05/1955 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1956 | 24/02/1956 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29439 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1958 | 14/08/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1959 | 11/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1960 | 01/07/1960 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/08/1941 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4889 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1867 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
28/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1943. Dep: 01/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 818 but not taken up | ||
28/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 918 |
||
11/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3115 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60918 |
||
06/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 15/01/1949. | ||
24/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1949. Dep: 26/01/1949. | ||
02/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/01/1950. Dep: 20/01/1950. | ||
21/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29479 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/11/1951. Dep: 21/11/1951. | ||
10/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1951. Dep: 08/01/1952. | ||
10/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/08/1953. Dep: 10/08/1953. | ||
07/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/09/1953. Dep: 08/09/1953. | ||
23/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/09/1953. Dep: 29/10/1953. | ||
17/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 19/04/1955. | ||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 10/05/1955. | ||
20/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1956. Dep: 24/02/1956. | ||
06/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29439 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 14/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1959. Dep: 11/03/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
20/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1960. Dep: 01/07/1960. | ||
08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60918 from York (North) (50A) | ||
17/10/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |