Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4884   06/06/1940
LNER (1946 1st) 813   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 913   09/12/1946
BR 60913   13/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 06/06/1940 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 12/10/1964 off Gateshead (52A)
Scrapping Sat 24/10/1964 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 24 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 24/10/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 06/06/1940
31B March 24/06/1951
37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 14/10/1951
52D Tweedmouth 14/09/1958
52B Heaton 13/01/1963
52A Gateshead 16/06/1963
   Withdrawn 12/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   12/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/06/1940 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3140)
24/08/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3058)
13/08/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9232)
09/06/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9546)
20/12/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29386)
07/04/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29345)
13/06/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29544)
18/11/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
12/05/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3006)
12/05/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
12/05/1959 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
03/03/1962 Smith speedometer fitted
03/03/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29370)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 10/10/1942 14/11/1942 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/08/1944 30/09/1944 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/07/1946 24/08/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 25/06/1948 13/08/1948 50 days General
Boiler number 9232 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60913
 
Doncaster Works 07/05/1950 09/06/1950 34 days General
Boiler number 9546 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 19/06/1950 21/06/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 21/11/1951 20/12/1951 30 days General
Boiler number 29386 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 30/04/1953 20/05/1953 21 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 08/03/1954 07/04/1954 31 days General
Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 07/05/1956 13/06/1956 38 days General
Boiler number 29544 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/11/1958 18/11/1958 8 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 13/03/1959 12/05/1959 61 days General
Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 29/01/1962 03/03/1962 34 days General
Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1963 26/02/1963 16 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1940 To Service To service as LNER Number 4884
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
10/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942.    
26/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 813 but not taken up    
13/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3058 (Diagram 109)
   
09/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 913    
25/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9232 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60913
   
07/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1950. Dep: 09/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9546 (Diagram 109)
   
19/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 21/06/1950.    
24/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
21/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1951. Dep: 20/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29386 (Diagram 109)
   
30/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 20/05/1953.    
08/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 07/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29345 (Diagram 109)
   
07/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1956. Dep: 13/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29544 (Diagram 109)
   
14/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
11/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/11/1958. Dep: 18/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
13/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1959. Dep: 12/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
29/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
13/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
11/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/02/1963. Dep: 26/02/1963.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
12/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 60913 from Gateshead (52A)    
24/10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev