|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1941 | 31/01/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1943 | 16/10/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1946 | 16/04/1946 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1947 | 01/05/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1949 | 10/05/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60911 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1951 | 12/06/1951 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1952 | 31/03/1952 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1952 | 09/12/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1954 | 25/08/1954 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1956 | 05/12/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29357 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1957 | 08/02/1957 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1958 | 02/10/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1958 | 10/12/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1960 | 12/01/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1960 | 29/03/1960 | 16 days | Light Casual | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1961 | 06/05/1961 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1961 | 26/05/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
31/10/1957 | Leicester (G.C.) MPD | This shed is expected to close and the work shared between Neasden and Darnall (41A). At start of winter time tables the A3's (60049/102/4/6/7/11) were exchanged for V2's 60831/42/54/63/911. This leaves no A3's on the G.C. at all. A5 69800 has replaced L1 67786. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/05/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4882 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1842 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
27/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1941. Dep: 31/01/1942. | ||
18/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. | ||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. | ||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 811 but not taken up | ||
06/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1946. Dep: 16/04/1946. | ||
24/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 911 | ||
19/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1947. Dep: 01/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3234 (Diagram 109) |
||
30/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1949. Dep: 10/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29363 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60911 |
||
09/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/05/1951. Dep: 12/06/1951. | ||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 31/03/1952. | ||
06/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1952. Dep: 09/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29347 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/07/1954. Dep: 25/08/1954. | ||
22/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1956. Dep: 05/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29357 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1957. Dep: 08/02/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
01/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 02/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 10/12/1958. | ||
06/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
06/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/01/1960. Dep: 12/01/1960. | ||
14/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1960. Dep: 29/03/1960. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
07/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1961. Dep: 06/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109) |
||
18/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1961. Dep: 26/05/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60911 from York (North) (50A) | ||
18/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |