|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 17/02/1942 | 19/03/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3118 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1943 | 25/06/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1948 | 28/08/1948 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60910 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1950 | 10/06/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2966 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1953 | 28/05/1953 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29413 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1954 | 14/04/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1954 | 23/06/1954 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1954 | 12/01/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29456 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1957 | 25/10/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29499 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1958 | 25/09/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1959 | 21/04/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1959 | 16/10/1959 | 117 days | General | Boiler number 29425 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1961 | 13/01/1962 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29503 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1963 | 03/09/1963 | 9 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/05/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4881 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1841 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
17/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1942. Dep: 19/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3118 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
11/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1943. Dep: 25/06/1943. | ||
31/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. | ||
13/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29348 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 810 but not taken up | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 910 | ||
22/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60910 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
01/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 10/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2966 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29534 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953. | ||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29413 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1954. Dep: 14/04/1954. | ||
12/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/06/1954. Dep: 23/06/1954. | ||
05/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1954. Dep: 12/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29456 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1957. Dep: 25/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29499 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 25/09/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1959. Dep: 21/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29425 (Diagram 109) Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
11/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1961. Dep: 13/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29503 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
26/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1963. Dep: 03/09/1963. | ||
15/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60910 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
21/05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |