|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1942 | 22/08/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8932 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1944 | 15/04/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 809 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1947 | 05/11/1947 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1948 | 05/01/1949 | 28 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 60909 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1949 | 01/06/1949 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1949 | 11/11/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29373 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1950 | 26/05/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1951 | 09/08/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1952 | 04/02/1952 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1952 | 25/08/1952 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1953 | 10/07/1953 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29478 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1957 | 11/07/1957 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1957 | 24/12/1957 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1958 | 12/09/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1959 | 29/05/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1959 | 25/11/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/05/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4880 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1840 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
25/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8932 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
18/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944. | ||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 809 |
||
22/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 909 | ||
06/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1947. Dep: 05/11/1947. | ||
09/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1948. Dep: 05/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60909 |
||
13/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1949. Dep: 01/06/1949. | ||
09/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1949. Dep: 11/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29373 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1950. Dep: 26/05/1950. | ||
10/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/07/1951. Dep: 09/08/1951. | ||
20/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1952. Dep: 04/02/1952. | ||
12/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1952. Dep: 25/08/1952. | ||
17/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1953. Dep: 10/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29369 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
04/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29478 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/06/1957. Dep: 11/07/1957. | ||
19/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 24/12/1957. | ||
09/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1958. Dep: 12/09/1958. | ||
27/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1959. Dep: 29/05/1959. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
21/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1959. Dep: 25/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29404 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/06/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
08/06/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60909 from Doncaster (36A) |