|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1944 | 08/07/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9546 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1947 | 25/11/1947 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 3499 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1949 | 13/01/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3118 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60906 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1950 | 21/09/1950 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1952 | 31/01/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29391 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1953 | 27/01/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1954 | 07/05/1954 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1956 | 30/04/1956 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1957 | 12/06/1957 | 63 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1958 | 22/05/1958 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1960 | 31/12/1960 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/04/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4877 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1837 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
03/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
05/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. | ||
29/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. | ||
27/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 08/07/1944. | ||
14/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. | ||
19/08/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 806 but not taken up | ||
22/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9546 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. | ||
05/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 906 | ||
12/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1947. Dep: 25/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3499 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1949. Dep: 13/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3118 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60906 |
||
22/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
28/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
13/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/09/1950. Dep: 21/09/1950. | ||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 31/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29391 (Diagram 109) |
||
20/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/01/1953. Dep: 27/01/1953. | ||
24/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 07/05/1954. | ||
24/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1956. Dep: 30/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/04/1957. Dep: 12/06/1957. | ||
15/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1958. Dep: 22/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1960. Dep: 31/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29485 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
28/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60906 from New England (34E) | ||
05/06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |