|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1942 | 11/04/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/12/1943 | 29/01/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1945 | 22/12/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | After collision Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 805 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 69 days | General | After Marshmoor derailment |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1947 | 03/12/1947 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3118 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1949 | 06/01/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2908 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60905 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1950 | 31/08/1950 | 9 days | Light Casual | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1951 | 02/02/1951 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1951 | 22/01/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29389 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1953 | 05/02/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1953 | 09/12/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1955 | 15/10/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29397 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1957 | 18/10/1957 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1959 | 15/10/1959 | 185 days | Heavy Casual | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1960 | 15/06/1960 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1961 | 25/02/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29392 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1962 | 05/05/1962 | 69 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/02/1946 | G.N. Section | The locos involved in the Potter's Bar collision were: 4876, down express, 4833, up express and 2679 up local train. etc:) | SLS/194604 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/04/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4876 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1836 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
07/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942. | ||
25/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1943. Dep: 29/01/1944. | ||
12/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
17/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945. | ||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 805 |
||
23/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 905 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
11/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: After Marshmoor derailment |
||
13/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1947. Dep: 03/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3118 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1949. Dep: 06/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2908 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60905 |
||
23/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 31/08/1950. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
21/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1951. Dep: 02/02/1951. | ||
17/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1951. Dep: 22/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29389 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1953. Dep: 05/02/1953. | ||
11/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1953. Dep: 09/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29397 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/09/1957. Dep: 18/10/1957. | ||
14/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 15/10/1959. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
22/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1960. Dep: 15/06/1960. | ||
19/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1961. Dep: 25/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29392 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
26/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1962. Dep: 05/05/1962. | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60905 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
18/10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |