Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4875   03/04/1940
LNER (1946 1st) 804   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 904   12/12/1946
BR 60904   30/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Thu 03/04/1940 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Thu 09/07/1964 off Gateshead (52A)
Scrapping Mon 24/08/1964 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Darlington Works for cutting up 11/8/64 but sent to Swindon Works 24/8/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 03/04/1940
52A Gateshead 08/06/1958
52B Heaton 03/01/1960
52A Gateshead 16/06/1963
   Withdrawn 09/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   09/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/04/1940 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3125)
08/11/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3124)
29/12/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9544)
31/12/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9172)
10/05/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29532)
25/11/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29340)
06/07/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29520)
06/07/1957 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
06/06/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
21/05/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29484)
21/05/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
20/10/1961 Smith speedometer fitted
20/10/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29384)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 27/09/1941 08/01/1941 -261 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/12/1943 22/01/1944 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/10/1945 29/12/1945 64 days General
Boiler number 9544 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 18/10/1947 15/11/1947 29 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/11/1949 31/12/1949 39 days General
Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60904
 
Doncaster Works 26/04/1951 30/05/1951 35 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 10/04/1952 10/05/1952 31 days General
Boiler number 29532 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 12/05/1952 13/05/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/09/1953 23/09/1953 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 10/11/1953 10/11/1953 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 25/11/1953 31/12/1953 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 26/10/1955 25/11/1955 31 days General
Boiler number 29340 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 30/05/1957 06/07/1957 38 days General
Boiler number 29520 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 11/07/1957 13/07/1957 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/06/1958 06/06/1958 5 days Unclassified
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 20/04/1959 21/05/1959 32 days General
Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109)
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 29/05/1959 10/06/1959 13 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/10/1959 28/10/1959 15 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 22/09/1961 20/10/1961 29 days General
Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 30/10/1961 10/11/1961 12 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/04/1940 To Service To service as LNER Number 4875
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
27/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1941. Dep: 08/01/1941.    
08/11/1941 Modification Diagram 109 number 3124 boiler fitted    
24/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944.    
27/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9544 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 804 but not taken up    
12/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 904    
18/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 15/11/1947.    
23/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1949. Dep: 31/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29486 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60904
   
26/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/04/1951. Dep: 30/05/1951.    
10/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29532 (Diagram 109)
   
12/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1952. Dep: 13/05/1952.    
23/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/09/1953. Dep: 23/09/1953.    
10/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/11/1953. Dep: 10/11/1953.    
25/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953.    
26/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1955. Dep: 25/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29340 (Diagram 109)
   
30/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29520 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
11/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957.    
02/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
20/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 21/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109)
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
29/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/05/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959.    
14/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1959. Dep: 28/10/1959.    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
22/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1961. Dep: 20/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
30/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1961. Dep: 10/11/1961.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
09/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 60904 from Gateshead (52A)    
24/08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev