Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4869   22/02/1940
LNER (1946 1st) 798   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 898   07/07/1946
BR 60898   06/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Thu 22/02/1940 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Thu 28/11/1963 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping Fri 13/12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Inverurie Works for cutting up 13/12/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) 22/02/1940
GHD Gateshead 28/03/1943
ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill 13/10/1945
   Withdrawn 28/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 03/12/1945
WDN   28/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/02/1940 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3113)
28/08/1941 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3085)
05/02/1943 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3018)
20/07/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2954)
05/07/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2998)
06/08/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3044)
19/09/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29447)
31/07/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29481)
23/04/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29539)
30/11/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29521)
04/12/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29468)
02/02/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29430)
02/02/1962 Smith speedometer fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 01/07/1941 28/08/1941 59 days General
Boiler number 3085 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 02/01/1943 05/02/1943 35 days General
Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1945 20/07/1945 89 days General
Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 31/05/1947 05/07/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/06/1948 06/08/1948 57 days General
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60898
 
Darlington Works 11/11/1949 17/12/1949 37 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 03/01/1951 01/02/1951 30 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 25/08/1952 19/09/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 21/06/1954 31/07/1954 41 days General
Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 02/08/1954 05/08/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Inverurie Works 06/04/1955 07/04/1955 2 days Unclassified
Left hand injector pad welded
 
Darlington Works 19/03/1956 23/04/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 3139 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 25/10/1957 30/11/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 03/01/1958 09/01/1958 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 02/11/1959 04/12/1959 33 days General
ATC fitted
Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 28/12/1961 02/02/1962 37 days General
Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/02/1940 To Service To service as LNER Number 4869
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
01/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1941. Dep: 28/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3085 (Diagram 109)
   
02/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1943. Dep: 05/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 109)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
23/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1945. Dep: 20/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2954 (Diagram 109)
   
13/10/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 798 but not taken up    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 898    
31/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2998 (Diagram 109)
   
11/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1948. Dep: 06/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3044 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60898
   
11/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949.    
03/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/01/1951. Dep: 01/02/1951.    
25/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29447 (Diagram 109)
   
21/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1954. Dep: 31/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29481 (Diagram 109)
   
02/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1954. Dep: 05/08/1954.    
06/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Left hand injector pad welded
   
19/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1956. Dep: 23/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3139 (Diagram 109)
   
25/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29521 (Diagram 109)
   
03/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1958. Dep: 09/01/1958.    
02/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1959. Dep: 04/12/1959.
Work undertaken:
ATC fitted
Boiler number 29468 (Diagram 109)
   
28/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1961. Dep: 02/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
28/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60898 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
13/12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev