|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1942 | 02/05/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1942 | 11/07/1942 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1944 | 22/04/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1946 | 16/02/1946 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1947 | 25/11/1947 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1950 | 04/05/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29415 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck Renumbered to BR 60897 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1951 | 08/03/1951 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1951 | 13/04/1951 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1952 | 09/07/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1954 | 28/07/1954 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1956 | 01/10/1956 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1958 | 05/11/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29523 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1959 | 22/04/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1961 | 17/06/1961 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/02/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4868 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1828 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
21/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1942. Dep: 02/05/1942. | ||
20/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
11/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 797 but not taken up | ||
17/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1946. Dep: 16/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 897 | ||
27/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1947. Dep: 25/11/1947. | ||
26/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1950. Dep: 04/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29415 (Diagram 109) Modified pony truck Renumbered to BR 60897 |
||
20/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1951. Dep: 08/03/1951. | ||
25/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1951. Dep: 13/04/1951. | ||
02/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/06/1952. Dep: 09/07/1952. | ||
13/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1954. Dep: 28/07/1954. | ||
14/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1956. Dep: 01/10/1956. | ||
03/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 05/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29523 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
17/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1959. Dep: 22/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
15/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 17/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60897 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
16/07/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |