Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4868   10/02/1940
LNER (1946 1st) 797   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 897   03/10/1946
BR 60897   03/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Tue 10/02/1940 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Tue 11/06/1963 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Tue 16/07/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster Works for cutting up 16/7/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) 10/02/1940
NWE New England 21/11/1942
36A Doncaster 17/09/1961
   Withdrawn 11/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   11/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/02/1940 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3109)
16/02/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3026)
04/05/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3278)
04/05/1950 Modified pony truck
22/09/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29494)
05/11/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
05/11/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29523)
22/04/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
17/06/1961 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29509)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 21/03/1942 02/05/1942 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/06/1942 11/07/1942 22 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/03/1944 22/04/1944 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/01/1946 16/02/1946 31 days General
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 27/10/1947 25/11/1947 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/03/1950 04/05/1950 40 days General
Boiler number 29415 (Diagram 109)
Modified pony truck
Renumbered to BR 60897
 
Doncaster Works 20/02/1951 08/03/1951 17 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 25/03/1951 13/04/1951 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 02/06/1952 09/07/1952 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 13/06/1954 28/07/1954 46 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 14/08/1956 22/09/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 3097 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 24/09/1956 01/10/1956 8 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/10/1958 05/11/1958 34 days General
Boiler number 29523 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 17/04/1959 22/04/1959 6 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 15/05/1961 17/06/1961 34 days General
Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/02/1940 To Service To service as LNER Number 4868
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
21/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1942. Dep: 02/05/1942.    
20/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942.    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
11/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 797 but not taken up    
17/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1946. Dep: 16/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109)
   
03/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 897    
27/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1947. Dep: 25/11/1947.    
26/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1950. Dep: 04/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29415 (Diagram 109)
Modified pony truck
Renumbered to BR 60897
   
20/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1951. Dep: 08/03/1951.    
25/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1951. Dep: 13/04/1951.    
02/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/06/1952. Dep: 09/07/1952.    
13/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1954. Dep: 28/07/1954.    
14/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3097 (Diagram 109)
   
24/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/09/1956. Dep: 01/10/1956.    
03/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1958. Dep: 05/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29523 (Diagram 109)
Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
   
17/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1959. Dep: 22/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
15/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 17/06/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29509 (Diagram 109)
   
17/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
11/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60897 from Doncaster (36A)    
16/07/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev