|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 21/10/1940 | 19/11/1940 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/06/1941 | 16/08/1941 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1942 | 02/10/1942 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1943 | 22/04/1943 | 23 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1944 | 31/08/1944 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 109) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/04/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1946 | 08/05/1946 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1947 | 19/12/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2942 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1947 | 05/01/1948 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1948 | 30/08/1948 | 47 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60894 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1951 | 13/12/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1953 | 16/10/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1955 | 05/02/1955 | 31 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1956 | 26/03/1956 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1958 | 20/06/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28058 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1961 | 05/04/1961 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/11/1963 | Inverurie Works (Cut Up) | Shopped: 42737, 45475, D6149, D8030. Cut Up: 60819/27, 60937, 64627, 65253, 65341. Four weeks ending 30th November, 1963. Shopped: 42909, 44955, 65918, D6147/57. Cut Up: 57269, 57336, 57634, 60840/94, 64950, 64629. Four weeks ending 28th December, 1963. Shopped: 42919, 44703, D3930, D6140/42/45/52/54/55/56. Cut Up: 60898, 60972, 64557, 64600, 65900, 90019. Total for 1963: Steam-33 Shopped, 31 other repairs; Diesel-31 Shopped, 15 other repairs; Cut Up 86. Two weeks ending 10th January, 1964. Shopped: 61132, D6150. Cut Up: 60161, 64619. In Shops on 10th January: 44722, 64558/99, D368, D3935, D6139/51/53. Awaiting scrapping: 60089, 60159, 64579. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/01/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4865 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1825 Allocated to St Margarets (STM) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
21/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1940. Dep: 19/11/1940. | ||
05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
30/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/06/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941. | ||
02/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1942. Dep: 02/10/1942. | ||
31/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1943. Dep: 22/04/1943. | ||
10/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1944. Dep: 31/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3289 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. | ||
25/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 794 but not taken up | ||
01/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1946. Dep: 08/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 894 | ||
14/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1947. Dep: 19/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2942 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1947. Dep: 05/01/1948. | ||
15/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/07/1948. Dep: 30/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60894 |
||
22/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29518 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
13/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1951. Dep: 13/12/1951. | ||
15/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1953. Dep: 16/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29461 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29451 (Diagram 109) |
||
21/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/02/1956. Dep: 26/03/1956. | ||
19/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28058 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1961. Dep: 05/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29533 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60894 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
15/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |