|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1941 | 06/09/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1943 | 06/11/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1945 | 22/09/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1947 | 14/05/1947 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1949 | 13/07/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3146 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60890 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1951 | 25/05/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1955 | 06/05/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1955 | 21/12/1955 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1957 | 03/08/1957 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1957 | 30/01/1958 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29435 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1960 | 29/09/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
31/01/1956 | York MPD (York station) | December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
31/12/1961 | Leicester GC | V2s 60815/50/63/90 have been placed in store and replaced by Bls 61077/1177/1206. B1 61381 an 40167 are also in store here. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/12/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4861 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1821 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
02/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1941. Dep: 06/09/1941. | ||
16/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1943. Dep: 06/11/1943. | ||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
04/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 790 but not taken up | ||
14/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 890 | ||
22/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1947. Dep: 14/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29361 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1949. Dep: 13/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3146 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60890 |
||
23/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 25/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29362 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
02/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
15/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
26/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
30/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29384 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955. | ||
03/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1955. Dep: 21/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1957. Dep: 03/08/1957. | ||
18/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1957. Dep: 30/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29435 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
22/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 29/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60890 from Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
29/08/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |