|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 16/04/1941 | 06/06/1941 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2896 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1943 | 14/09/1943 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1947 | 24/01/1948 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2934 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E887 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1948 | 22/01/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1950 | 09/12/1950 | 41 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1951 | 19/01/1952 | 39 days | Light Casual | Modified pony truck |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1952 | 21/01/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1954 | 23/06/1954 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1955 | 30/03/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29344 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1956 | 11/01/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1957 | 29/01/1957 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1958 | 15/04/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1958 | 08/05/1958 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1958 | 24/11/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1959 | 01/07/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1959 | 10/07/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1961 | 29/09/1961 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1961 | 27/10/1961 | 16 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/07/1962 | York South MPD | Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. | SLS/196208 |
20/09/1964 | Swindon Works (Scrap yard) | On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. | SLS/196410 |
11/10/1964 | Swindon Works (C shop area) | Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 | SLS/196411 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4858 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1818 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
16/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1941. Dep: 06/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2896 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
18/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1943. Dep: 14/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29398 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 787 but not taken up | ||
24/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 887 | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 24/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2934 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E887 |
||
31/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60887 | ||
21/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29460 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
30/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/10/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950. | ||
29/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
05/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
12/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1951. Dep: 19/01/1952. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
06/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
16/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1952. Dep: 21/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28050 (Diagram 109) |
||
01/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
15/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 23/06/1954. | ||
02/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 30/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29344 (Diagram 109) |
||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
05/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1956. Dep: 11/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29492 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1957. Dep: 29/01/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
11/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1958. Dep: 15/04/1958. | ||
07/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1958. Dep: 08/05/1958. | ||
17/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1958. Dep: 24/11/1958. Work undertaken: Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
25/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 01/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29430 (Diagram 109) |
||
07/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1959. Dep: 10/07/1959. | ||
28/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1961. Dep: 29/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
12/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/10/1961. Dep: 27/10/1961. | ||
06/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60887 from York (North) (50A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |