|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/03/1941 | 12/04/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1942 | 16/04/1942 | 15 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2898 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1942 | 10/12/1942 | 37 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1945 | 10/02/1945 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1946 | 02/02/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 26 days | General | Modified pony truck |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1947 | 11/10/1947 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1948 | 10/04/1948 | 38 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60884 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1949 | 05/02/1949 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/02/1949 | 07/03/1949 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1950 | 26/04/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1952 | 09/02/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1952 | 12/02/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29390 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1954 | 30/09/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1956 | 22/03/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29353 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1956 | 14/09/1956 | 66 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1957 | 25/02/1957 | 49 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1958 | 26/11/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29357 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1958 | 11/12/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1959 | 11/02/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1963 | 01/03/1963 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/10/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4855 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1815 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
03/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1942. Dep: 16/04/1942. | ||
16/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2898 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1942. Dep: 10/12/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
01/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 784 but not taken up | ||
19/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946. | ||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 884 | ||
26/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Modified pony truck |
||
09/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1947. Dep: 11/10/1947. | ||
04/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60884 |
||
15/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 05/02/1949. | ||
18/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1949. Dep: 07/03/1949. | ||
14/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1950. Dep: 26/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
29/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
05/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
15/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29525 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1952. Dep: 12/02/1952. | ||
21/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29390 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 30/09/1954. | ||
08/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
23/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1956. Dep: 22/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29353 (Diagram 109) |
||
11/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1956. Dep: 14/09/1956. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
23/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
08/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/01/1957. Dep: 25/02/1957. | ||
21/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1958. Dep: 26/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29357 (Diagram 109) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
03/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/12/1958. Dep: 11/12/1958. | ||
06/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1959. Dep: 11/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
21/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1963. Dep: 01/03/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109) |
||
26/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
05/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
06/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60884 from Darlington (51A) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |