|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 18/03/1941 | 26/04/1941 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2893 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1942 | 20/11/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2899 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1942 | 18/12/1942 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 2966 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 44 days | Heavy | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1948 | 24/07/1948 | 34 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60883 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1950 | 02/05/1950 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/03/1951 | 02/04/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1951 | 31/01/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/04/1953 | 13/04/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1954 | 01/04/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1954 | 07/04/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1954 | 15/10/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1955 | 14/12/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1959 | 07/09/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28070 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1959 | 25/09/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1962 | 02/07/1962 | 49 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/10/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4854 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1814 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
18/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1941. Dep: 26/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2893 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1942. Dep: 20/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2899 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/12/1942. Dep: 18/12/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
20/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2966 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 783 but not taken up | ||
20/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/09/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 883 | ||
21/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1948. Dep: 24/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60883 |
||
24/07/1948 | Livery | Change of livery to Black (Lining: Unlined) | ||
09/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1950. Dep: 02/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3270 (Diagram 109) |
||
29/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1951. Dep: 02/04/1951. | ||
28/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1951. Dep: 31/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29519 (Diagram 109) |
||
12/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/02/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. | ||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
10/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1953. Dep: 13/04/1953. | ||
03/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1954. Dep: 01/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29512 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1954. Dep: 07/04/1954. | ||
11/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954. | ||
08/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1955. Dep: 14/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29458 (Diagram 109) |
||
15/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
06/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29496 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1959. Dep: 07/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28070 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
16/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1959. Dep: 25/09/1959. | ||
16/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. Work undertaken: Smith speedometer fitted |
||
15/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1962. Dep: 02/07/1962. | ||
24/02/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60883 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |