|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1942 | 19/09/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1944 | 17/05/1944 | 26 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1947 | 24/06/1947 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1949 | 26/07/1949 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60879 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1951 | 15/06/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29364 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1953 | 14/10/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1956 | 23/03/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29412 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1958 | 03/06/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 29402 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1960 | 13/01/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/08/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4850 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1916 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
15/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942. | ||
22/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1944. Dep: 17/05/1944. | ||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. | ||
24/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 779 but not taken up | ||
26/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 879 | ||
17/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 24/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29494 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1949. Dep: 26/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60879 |
||
18/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1951. Dep: 15/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29364 (Diagram 109) |
||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
16/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1953. Dep: 14/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29431 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29412 (Diagram 109) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
01/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1958. Dep: 03/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29402 (Diagram 109) |
||
06/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
05/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1960. Dep: 13/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29549 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60879 from York (North) (50A) | ||
28/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |