|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1947 | 23/05/1947 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 29382 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1949 | 24/06/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60878 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1951 | 24/07/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1953 | 05/11/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29403 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1956 | 18/05/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29391 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1957 | 24/05/1957 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1957 | 06/11/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1957 | 05/12/1957 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1958 | 24/01/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1959 | 11/12/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1961 | 24/03/1961 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/07/1940 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4849 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1915 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
06/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. | ||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 778 but not taken up | ||
18/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 878 | ||
24/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 23/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29382 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1949. Dep: 24/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60878 |
||
18/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1951. Dep: 24/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29370 (Diagram 109) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
22/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
07/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1953. Dep: 05/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29403 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
14/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1956. Dep: 18/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29391 (Diagram 109) |
||
17/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957. | ||
02/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/11/1957. Dep: 06/11/1957. | ||
22/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1957. Dep: 05/12/1957. | ||
16/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1958. Dep: 24/01/1958. | ||
02/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
09/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1959. Dep: 11/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29352 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
24/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/02/1961. Dep: 24/03/1961. | ||
22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60878 from York (North) (50A) | ||
06/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |