|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1939 | 14/10/1939 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1942 | 28/02/1942 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1944 | 12/02/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1946 | 02/02/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2895 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1947 | 15/08/1947 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1949 | 30/12/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60874 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1951 | 22/11/1951 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1953 | 03/02/1953 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1953 | 11/08/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1955 | 13/07/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29503 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1957 | 09/08/1957 | 52 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1959 | 17/09/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/02/1964 | Branch line news (Scrap Yard) | Passenger services will be withdrawn from Hanley Loop (Etruria to Kidsgrove Liverpool Road) and Stoke to Silverdale branches from 2nd March, from the Aberdare-Abercynon and Cardiff Clarence Road branches from 16th March, from the Kemble to Cirencester, Kemble to Tetbury and Sheringham-Melton Constable branches from 6th April. The Waterside branch (from Old Dinting Goods GF, Mottram Yard) is to be closed completely on 2nd March. The Pinnox branch (Tunstall Junction to Longport Junction) was closed completely from 16th February, although the track is to be retained. From Pleasley Junction to 70 yards short of Messrs. Hollins coal siding (approx. 1 mile) is to be closed from 3rd March and the line thence to Pleasley East GF from 31st December, 1964. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D25, D26, D30, D170, D177, D179, D3140, D3244, D3677, D5371, D7587 painted, D7589 nearly complete, D7590 motors mounted, D7591 motors mounted, D7592 shell, D7593 shell, D7594 shell, d12113, 47482, 60146, 60822, 61032, 61319, 62060, 63458, 65789, 90272, 90345. Weigh House: D22, D5107, 62001. Stripping Shop: 43987, 90483. Works Yard: D2700, D5113, D5148, D7588 painted, 42165, 43144, 60124, 60802, 62065, 63460, 65033, 65099, 68046, 73071, 73097, 75006, 75056. Crossing: D11, D3378. Scrap Yard: 42407, 47589, 60874, 68039, 68061, 90624. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/06/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4845 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1900 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
15/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
16/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. | ||
14/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939. | ||
16/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
17/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942. | ||
29/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 774 but not taken up | ||
05/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2895 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 874 | ||
23/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
06/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1947. Dep: 15/08/1947. | ||
22/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1949. Dep: 30/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29383 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60874 |
||
22/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1951. Dep: 22/11/1951. | ||
24/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 03/02/1953. | ||
06/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1953. Dep: 11/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29365 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1955. Dep: 13/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29503 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/06/1957. Dep: 09/08/1957. | ||
13/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1959. Dep: 17/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29459 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
22/08/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
22/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60874 from New England (34E) |