Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4844   18/05/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 773   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 873   01/11/1946
BR (Tmp) E873   05/02/1948
BR 60873   17/06/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
20/06/1939 COLDSTREAMER

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1899
To Service Sat 18/05/1939 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping Wed 30/10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Notes
Notes Into Cowlairs Works for cutting up 30/10/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 18/05/1939
KX Kings Cross 20/06/1939
64A St Margarets 15/04/1951
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 64A St Margarets w/e 21/04/1951
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/05/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9166)
05/01/1946 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3118)
14/06/1947 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3028)
17/06/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3309)
09/03/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29353)
13/03/1952 Modified pony truck
27/01/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28057)
01/02/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29374)
26/04/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 28057)
30/12/1961 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 05/06/1939 17/06/1939 13 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 22/11/1941 03/01/1942 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 20/11/1943 25/12/1943 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 13/05/1944 03/06/1944 22 days Light Repair
Newark derailment
 
Doncaster Works 01/12/1945 05/01/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3118 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 28/05/1947 14/06/1947 18 days General
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 23/01/1948 05/02/1948 14 days Light Casual
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E873
 
Doncaster Works 10/05/1949 17/06/1949 39 days General
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60873
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1951 09/03/1951 24 days General
Boiler number 29353 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 15/03/1951 17/03/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/03/1952 13/03/1952 10 days Light Casual
Modified pony truck
 
Darlington Works 29/12/1952 27/01/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 28057 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 26/07/1955 10/09/1955 47 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 12/09/1955 14/09/1955 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/10/1956 13/11/1956 29 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 23/08/1957 28/08/1957 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/12/1957 01/02/1958 40 days General
Boiler number 29374 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 03/02/1958 04/02/1958 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/03/1960 26/04/1960 42 days General
Boiler number 28057 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 21/11/1961 30/12/1961 40 days Light Casual
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 28/08/1962 28/09/1962 32 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/05/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4844
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1899
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
05/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939.    
20/06/1939 Naming Named 'COLDSTREAMER'    
20/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
22/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1941. Dep: 03/01/1942.    
20/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1943. Dep: 25/12/1943.    
13/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Newark derailment
   
01/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1945. Dep: 05/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3118 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 773 but not taken up    
01/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 873    
28/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 109)
   
23/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1948. Dep: 05/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E873
   
10/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1949. Dep: 17/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60873
   
14/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1951. Dep: 09/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29353 (Diagram 109)
   
15/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951.    
15/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
04/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Modified pony truck
   
29/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 27/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28057 (Diagram 109)
   
26/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/07/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955.    
12/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1955. Dep: 14/09/1955.    
16/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1956. Dep: 13/11/1956.    
23/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1957. Dep: 28/08/1957.    
24/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 01/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29374 (Diagram 109)
   
03/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 04/02/1958.    
16/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1960. Dep: 26/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28057 (Diagram 109)
   
21/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1961. Dep: 30/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
28/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1962. Dep: 28/09/1962.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60873 from St Margarets (64A)    
30/10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev