|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1941 | 04/10/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1943 | 29/05/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1949 | 16/03/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60871 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1950 | 05/01/1951 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1951 | 06/06/1951 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1951 | 26/11/1951 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1953 | 03/07/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1955 | 26/07/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1957 | 07/09/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28052 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1958 | 16/10/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1959 | 01/08/1959 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1959 | 21/09/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1962 | 20/03/1962 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Newcastle Station | Locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 60871, 62719 an 69892. | SLS/194905 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/09/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4842 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1812 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
11/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941. | ||
17/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943. | ||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. | ||
03/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 771 | ||
18/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 871 | ||
29/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29488 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1949. Dep: 16/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60871 |
||
28/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1950. Dep: 05/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29434 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
28/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 06/06/1951. | ||
03/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 26/11/1951. | ||
10/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
24/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1953. Dep: 03/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29368 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1955. Dep: 26/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29378 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/08/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
07/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1957. Dep: 07/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28052 (Diagram 109) |
||
10/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1958. Dep: 16/10/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
04/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/06/1959. Dep: 01/08/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1959. Dep: 21/09/1959. | ||
07/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
08/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1962. Dep: 20/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2937 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60871 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
07/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |