|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1942 | 07/03/1942 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1945 | 17/02/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1946 | 13/07/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2965 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 869 |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1948 | 02/04/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2931 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60869 |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1950 | 25/05/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1951 | 18/10/1951 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1952 | 14/05/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 29409 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1954 | 12/05/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1956 | 15/02/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1958 | 28/04/1958 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1958 | 12/05/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1959 | 28/04/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/02/1960 | 06/04/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1960 | 03/05/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1961 | 14/07/1961 | 71 days | Heavy Casual | Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4840 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1810 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
17/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942. | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
21/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. | ||
06/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 769 but not taken up | ||
08/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2965 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 869 |
||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. | ||
25/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1948. Dep: 02/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2931 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60869 |
||
19/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1950. Dep: 25/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 109) |
||
22/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1951. Dep: 18/10/1951. | ||
16/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1952. Dep: 14/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29409 (Diagram 109) |
||
04/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1954. Dep: 12/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29487 (Diagram 109) |
||
03/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1956. Dep: 15/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29376 (Diagram 109) |
||
19/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 28/04/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
06/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1958. Dep: 12/05/1958. | ||
27/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1959. Dep: 28/04/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
29/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1960. Dep: 06/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29524 (Diagram 109) |
||
27/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1960. Dep: 03/05/1960. | ||
05/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1961. Dep: 14/07/1961. Work undertaken: Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced) |
||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60869 from New England (34E) | ||
27/11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |