Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 372 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3963 Week
» 14098 Month
» 330329 Year
» 841431 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4839   31/07/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 768   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 868   10/11/1946
BR 60868   27/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 31/07/1939 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Mon 26/09/1966 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 27 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap, Wishaw 11/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 31/07/1939
HTN Heaton 19/08/1939
GHD Gateshead 28/03/1943
HTN Heaton 06/02/1949
52A Gateshead 06/07/1952
52B Heaton 03/01/1960
52A Gateshead 16/06/1963
64A St Margarets 10/10/1965
   Withdrawn 26/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 3w/e 30/10/1965
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   26/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
31/07/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3044)
24/12/1940 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2899)
05/08/1942 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2978)
26/02/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 8929)
12/03/1949 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2893)
04/04/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29454)
09/05/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29344)
11/02/1955 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29484)
07/11/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29537)
19/09/1958 Mechanical elements of ATC fitted
19/09/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29532)
19/09/1958 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
25/02/1959 Electrical elements of ATC fitted
12/08/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29511)
27/09/1962 Smith speedometer fitted
27/09/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29413)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 14/11/1940 24/12/1940 41 days General
Boiler number 2899 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1941 04/02/1941 11 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/06/1942 05/08/1942 45 days General
Boiler number 2978 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 26/01/1944 26/02/1944 32 days General
Boiler number 8929 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 20/01/1945 03/03/1945 43 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 08/09/1945 20/10/1945 43 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 29/03/1947 03/05/1947 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/01/1949 12/03/1949 44 days General
Boiler number 2893 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1950 25/04/1950 55 days Light Intermediate  
Darlington Works 27/02/1951 04/04/1951 37 days General
Boiler number 29454 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 30/03/1953 09/05/1953 41 days General
Boiler number 29344 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 11/05/1953 19/05/1953 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/01/1955 11/02/1955 33 days General
Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1955 21/03/1955 20 days Unclassified  
Gateshead Works 15/08/1955 20/09/1955 37 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 09/10/1956 07/11/1956 30 days General
Boiler number 29537 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 14/08/1958 19/09/1958 37 days General
Boiler number 29532 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 23/02/1959 25/02/1959 3 days Unclassified
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 05/11/1959 20/11/1959 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/06/1960 12/08/1960 59 days General
Boiler number 3158 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 13/02/1962 14/03/1962 30 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/08/1962 27/09/1962 38 days General
Boiler number 29413 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/07/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4839
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
19/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
14/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1940. Dep: 24/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2899 (Diagram 109)
   
25/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 04/02/1941.    
22/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1942. Dep: 05/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2978 (Diagram 109)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
26/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8929 (Diagram 109)
   
20/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.    
08/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 768 but not taken up    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 868    
29/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947.    
27/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 60868    
28/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1949. Dep: 12/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2893 (Diagram 109)
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
02/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/03/1950. Dep: 25/04/1950.    
27/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29454 (Diagram 109)
   
06/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
30/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29344 (Diagram 109)
   
11/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 19/05/1953.    
10/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 11/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29484 (Diagram 109)
   
02/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 21/03/1955.    
15/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1955. Dep: 20/09/1955.    
09/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1956. Dep: 07/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29537 (Diagram 109)
   
14/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1958. Dep: 19/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29532 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
23/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1959. Dep: 25/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Electrical elements of ATC fitted
   
05/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/11/1959. Dep: 20/11/1959.    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
15/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1960. Dep: 12/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3158 (Diagram 109)
   
13/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1962. Dep: 14/03/1962.    
21/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1962. Dep: 27/09/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29413 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
10/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
26/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60868 from St Margarets (64A)    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev