|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1942 | 21/02/1942 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1943 | 10/04/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1944 | 30/12/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 867 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1948 | 09/02/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E867 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1950 | 27/04/1950 | 82 days | General | Boiler number 2965 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60867 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1952 | 21/02/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1952 | 31/01/1953 | 54 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1954 | 22/11/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29419 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1957 | 28/03/1957 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29529 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1957 | 17/04/1957 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1958 | 15/08/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1959 | 17/03/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1959 | 18/08/1959 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1959 | 03/12/1959 | 11 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/07/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4838 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1808 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. | ||
03/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942. | ||
06/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943. | ||
18/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 767 but not taken up | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 867 |
||
12/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1948. Dep: 09/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E867 |
||
05/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1950. Dep: 27/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2965 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60867 |
||
17/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1952. Dep: 21/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29394 (Diagram 109) |
||
09/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/12/1952. Dep: 31/01/1953. | ||
19/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1954. Dep: 22/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29419 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
25/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1957. Dep: 28/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29529 (Diagram 109) |
||
05/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1957. Dep: 17/04/1957. | ||
12/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1958. Dep: 15/08/1958. Work undertaken: Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
13/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1959. Dep: 17/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29445 (Diagram 109) Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
06/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/07/1959. Dep: 18/08/1959. | ||
23/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/11/1959. Dep: 03/12/1959. | ||
01/05/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
01/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60867 from New England (34E) |