Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4837   06/07/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 766   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 866   06/12/1946
BR 60866   09/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Sat 06/07/1939 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off New England (34E)
Scrapping Fri 24/05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster Works for cutting up 24/5/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) 06/07/1939
NWE New England 21/11/1942
KX Kings Cross 12/11/1944
NWE New England 27/10/1946
36A Doncaster 16/11/1958
34F Grantham 11/06/1961
34E New England 10/09/1961
   Withdrawn 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 34F Grantham 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/07/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3039)
09/04/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3022)
05/07/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 9234)
23/05/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29411)
20/05/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29412)
13/03/1956 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29416)
22/05/1958 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
22/05/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29356)
15/10/1960 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29488)
15/10/1960 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 19/07/1941 30/08/1941 43 days General  
Doncaster Works 25/09/1943 30/10/1943 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 14/07/1945 01/09/1945 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/01/1947 15/02/1947 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/02/1948 09/04/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60866
 
Doncaster Works 14/01/1949 22/01/1949 9 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 20/05/1950 05/07/1950 47 days General
Boiler number 9234 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 19/02/1952 04/03/1952 15 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 26/04/1952 23/05/1952 28 days General
Boiler number 29411 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 21/04/1954 20/05/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 29412 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 04/02/1956 13/03/1956 39 days General
Boiler number 29416 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 21/04/1958 22/05/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
 
Darlington Works 13/06/1960 15/10/1960 125 days General
Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/07/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4837
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
19/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941.    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
25/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1943. Dep: 30/10/1943.    
12/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
14/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 766 but not taken up    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
06/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 866    
11/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 15/02/1947.    
27/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1948. Dep: 09/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60866
   
14/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949.    
20/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1950. Dep: 05/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9234 (Diagram 109)
   
19/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1952. Dep: 04/03/1952.    
26/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1952. Dep: 23/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29411 (Diagram 109)
   
21/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1954. Dep: 20/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29412 (Diagram 109)
   
04/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1956. Dep: 13/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29416 (Diagram 109)
   
21/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1958. Dep: 22/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29356 (Diagram 109)
Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
   
16/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
13/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (34F)    
10/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 60866 from New England (34E)    
24/05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev