|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1940 | 25/01/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1943 | 17/07/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1945 | 16/06/1945 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 2931 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1946 | 19/10/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1948 | 04/03/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2910 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E865 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1950 | 21/04/1950 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60865 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1952 | 04/03/1952 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1954 | 30/06/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29516 (Diagram 109) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1956 | 28/09/1956 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1959 | 04/02/1959 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1959 | 20/03/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1959 | 06/05/1959 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1959 | 14/11/1959 | 93 days | General | Boiler number 29547 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1961 | 01/11/1961 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1962 | 07/06/1962 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1962 | 03/07/1962 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1963 | 18/10/1963 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1964 | 19/06/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1950 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. | SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/06/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4836 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1806 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
21/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 25/01/1941. | ||
12/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 17/07/1943. | ||
21/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2931 (Diagram 109) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 765 but not taken up | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. | ||
02/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 865 | ||
12/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946. | ||
29/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1948. Dep: 04/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2910 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E865 |
||
20/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1950. Dep: 21/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29396 (Diagram 109) Renumbered to BR 60865 |
||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
14/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
20/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
03/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/02/1952. Dep: 04/03/1952. | ||
19/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1954. Dep: 30/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29516 (Diagram 109) |
||
23/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1956. Dep: 28/09/1956. | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
16/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1959. Dep: 04/02/1959. | ||
16/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959. | ||
14/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959. | ||
14/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1959. Dep: 14/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29547 (Diagram 109) Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted |
||
18/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1961. Dep: 01/11/1961. | ||
01/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1962. Dep: 07/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109) Smith speedometer fitted |
||
19/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1962. Dep: 03/07/1962. | ||
30/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1963. Dep: 18/10/1963. | ||
19/06/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/06/1964. Dep: 19/06/1964. | ||
14/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60865 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
07/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell |