Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 4836   29/06/1939
LNER (1946 1st) 765   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 865   02/08/1946
BR (Tmp) E865   04/03/1948
BR 60865   21/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class V2
Company History LNER
Wheels 2-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
To Service Mon 29/06/1939 to New England (NWE)
Withdrawal Mon 14/06/1965 off Gateshead (52A)
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell)
Service Life 25 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Ellis Metals, Swalwell 7/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NWE New England (New) 29/06/1939
31B March 24/06/1951
37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 14/10/1951
52D Tweedmouth 14/09/1958
52B Heaton 30/12/1962
52A Gateshead 16/06/1963
   Withdrawn 14/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 52D Tweedmouth 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 52B Heaton 5w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 14/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/06/1939 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3037)
16/06/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2931)
04/03/1948 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2910)
21/04/1950 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 2962)
30/06/1954 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29516)
14/11/1959 Automatic Train Control (ATC) fitted
14/11/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29547)
14/11/1959 Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
07/06/1962 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29548)
07/06/1962 Smith speedometer fitted


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 21/12/1940 25/01/1941 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/06/1943 17/07/1943 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/04/1945 16/06/1945 57 days General
Boiler number 2931 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 11/05/1946 15/06/1946 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/10/1946 19/10/1946 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 29/01/1948 04/03/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 2910 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E865
 
Doncaster Works 20/02/1950 21/04/1950 61 days General
Boiler number 2962 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60865
 
Doncaster Works 03/02/1952 04/03/1952 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 19/05/1954 30/06/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 29516 (Diagram 109)
 
Darlington Works 23/08/1956 28/09/1956 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Darlington Works 16/01/1959 04/02/1959 20 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 16/03/1959 20/03/1959 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/04/1959 06/05/1959 23 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/08/1959 14/11/1959 93 days General
Boiler number 29547 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
 
Darlington Works 18/10/1961 01/11/1961 15 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 01/05/1962 07/06/1962 38 days General
Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
 
Darlington Works 19/06/1962 03/07/1962 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 14/10/1963 18/10/1963 5 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 19/06/1964 19/06/1964 1 day Weighing  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1939 To Service To service as LNER Number 4836
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number
Allocated to New England (NWE)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
21/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1940. Dep: 25/01/1941.    
12/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 17/07/1943.    
21/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 16/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2931 (Diagram 109)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 765 but not taken up    
11/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946.    
02/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 865    
12/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 19/10/1946.    
29/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1948. Dep: 04/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2910 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E865
   
20/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1950. Dep: 21/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 2962 (Diagram 109)
Renumbered to BR 60865
   
24/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B)    
03/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/02/1952. Dep: 04/03/1952.    
19/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1954. Dep: 30/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29516 (Diagram 109)
   
23/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1956. Dep: 28/09/1956.    
14/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D)    
16/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1959. Dep: 04/02/1959.    
16/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1959. Dep: 20/03/1959.    
14/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959.    
14/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1959. Dep: 14/11/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29547 (Diagram 109)
Separate cylinders fitted (monobloc replaced)
   
18/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1961. Dep: 01/11/1961.    
01/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1962. Dep: 07/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29548 (Diagram 109)
Smith speedometer fitted
   
19/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1962. Dep: 03/07/1962.    
30/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
14/10/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1963. Dep: 18/10/1963.    
19/06/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/06/1964. Dep: 19/06/1964.    
14/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60865 from Gateshead (52A)    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell    

prev prev